THE FRIENDSHIP PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports disadvantaged children in need by 121 weekly meetings of 2/3 hours with an 'older friend', who is a volunteer. The child may have their own problems or the child may be in a family or care, that make it more difficult for the child to thrive. Aim is to improve the child's self esteem, allow them to have some fun and build confidence, plus widen their experience in a safe supported way.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 May 1986: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDSHIP PROJECT FOR CHILDREN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS CHERYLL RAWBONE | Chair | 12 May 1986 |
|
|||||
Nishi Mehta | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashima Rani Chander | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Miller | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Jones | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ken Smith Treasurer | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JON GIBBONS | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARK BARRETT | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Mr Chris Buck Webmaster and IT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.17k | £55.88k | £63.37k | £67.63k | £78.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.58k | £55.20k | £59.61k | £78.35k | £92.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1986 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1995 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF CHILDREN PARTICULARLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 6 AND 16 YEARS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF DEVELOPING SOCIAL SKILLS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE PROJECT THINKS FIT INCLUDING THE ORGANISATION OF CONTACTS BETWEEN SUCH CHILDREN AND RELIABLE OLDER PERSONS ABLE TO HELP THEM DEVELOP SUCH SKILLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 NORTHUMBERLAND ROAD
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 6HA
- Phone:
- 01926332179
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window