Think on it

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity raises funds through a variety of different means in order to support people who have been adversley affected by the Covid-19 pandemic. We achieve this by issuing grants to individuals and charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 May 2021: CIO registration
- C19 REFLECTIONS (Working name)
- COVID REFLECTIONS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashok Subramanian | Chair | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Hetherington Palmer | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Lindsay Subramanian | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 230 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 September 2024 | 595 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 September 2024 | 595 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 05 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED ON 01 AUG 2022 AMENDED ON 15 AUG 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE UK, BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE FOLLOWING THE IMPACT OF THE COVID 19 PANDEMIC, OR THE RELIEF OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RELATED TO THE COVID 19 PANDEMIC. THE OBJECTS WILL BE MET THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS ,WORKING TO LOWER THE IMPACT OF COVID 19 OR ANY MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jackson House
Station Road
Chingford
London
E4 7BU
- Phone:
- 0203 319 3699
- Email:
- hello@covidreflections.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window