Trustees THE COWBRIDGE AND DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 517702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David William Pierce Chair
None on record
Sarah Palmer Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Deborah Clare Fisher Trustee 13 June 2024
COWBRIDGE HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
Malcolm Wilson Trustee 25 January 2024
None on record
Peter Davies Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
Geoffrey Cox Trustee 21 September 2007
None on record