QUEEN ELIZABETH II PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 517707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of sporting facilities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £15,553
Total expenditure: £16,985

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 March 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • QE 2 PLAYING FIELDS (Working name)
  • QE II PLAYING FIELDS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN JOHN HIGHTON Chair
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time
David Sleight Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
MICHAEL THOMAS SEERY Trustee 22 October 2014
WHALLEY VILLAGE HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time
GILL DARBYSHIRE Trustee 22 October 2014
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time
MARK DARBYSHIRE Trustee 22 October 2014
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time
JOHN STEPHEN KENNY Trustee 20 July 2011
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time
JUNE MARGARET BROWN Trustee
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time
WHALLEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ADAM COTTAM'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
JONATHAN FREDERIC SMITH Trustee
WHALLEY SPORTS COMMUNITY PARK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.37k £511 £501 £513 £15.55k
Total expenditure £11.50k £500 £500 £500 £16.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 KING STREET
WHALLEY
CLITHEROE
BB7 9SL
Phone:
01254823983
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available