KHAN FOUNDATION BANGLADESH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The following are projects we are particularly keen to complete:- To install tube wells and provide people with convenient access to clean and safe water. - To distribute food packages throughout the year to end hunger, malnutrition and other compounding health problems. To provide essential medical assistance to terminally ill patients and save lives. Provide safe and secure accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 06 July 2021: CIO registration
- KHAN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mosharaf Khan | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr AYUB KHAN | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MONIR KHAN | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shahid KHAN | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS LIVING IN BANGLADESH THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, MEDICINE, ACCESS TO CLEAN AND SAFE WATER TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; B) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR HOUSE REPAIRS AND SCHOOL ADMISSION FEES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS; C) THE PROVISION OF SKILLS TRAINING AND THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16-20 BRIDGE STREET
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 1AA
- Phone:
- 07903557975
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window