THE NOTTINGHAM TRENT UNIVERSITY TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and the relief of poverty among students attending or visiting Nottingham Trent Universty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 19 June 1986: Standard registration
- 22 June 2023: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- THE DIRECTORS FUND (Previous name)
- THE VICE CHANCELLOR'S FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £1.50k | £1.34k | £60 | £82 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUSTS DATED 10 JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED ON 29 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 10 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG STUDENTS ATTENDING OR VISITIN TRENT POLYTECHNIC AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR UCH PERSONS SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window