GENESIS PROJECT MIDDLESBROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the CIO is the advancement of the Christian faith through actively sharing the love of God , supporting the local community and providing relief for people in need, primarily but not exclusively within Grove Hill, Beechwood and Saltersgill areas of Middlesbrough. The CIO provides services from a Christian Community Centre in Grove Hill.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,685 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 30 April 2021: CIO registration
- 28 November 2023: Funds received from 1100971 NORTH EAST HELP LINK TRUST LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DICKINSON | Chair | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Land | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Arundale | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stella Worton | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Wheway | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.10k | £143.52k | £187.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.31k | £133.85k | £179.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.98k | N/A | £14.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH ACTIVELY SHARING THE LOVE OF GOD, SUPPORTING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND PROVIDING RELIEF FOR PEOPLE IN NEED, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN GROVE HILL, BEECHWOOD AND SALTERSGILL AREAS OF MIDDLESBROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Oswalds Church Hall
Marton Grove Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS4 2SG
- Phone:
- 07779110313
- Email:
- genesismbro@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window