EVERLASTING FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE AID AND SUPPORT TO THE POOR AND MOST NEEDY , BY WAY OF FOOD AID, CLOTHES AID, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, SELF EARNING PROJECTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Central African Republic
- Ghana
- India
- Pakistan
- Turkey
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AKEEL MOHAMMED KHAN | Chair | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Hanif UMERJI | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Reshma Bano KHAN | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASHFAK JUMA | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/02/2022 | 23/02/2023 | 23/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.19k | £44.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £16.14k | £43.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 February 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 February 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT[S] OF THE CIO IS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ACROSS THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT(SCOTLAND)ACT 2005]AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CHARNOCK DRIVE
BOLTON
BL1 2HT
- Phone:
- 07738565126
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window