Financial history HOSPICE OF THE VALLEYS

Charity number: 517724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.23m £1.90m £1.70m £1.87m £1.83m
Total expenditure £1.87m £1.77m £1.97m £2.12m £2.13m
Income from government contracts £3.50k £462.99k £508.02k £505.10k £707.43k
Income from government grants £82.60k £736.22k £213.01k £68.59k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £93.87k £176.90k £176.06k £442.41k £270.56k
Income - Other trading activities £478.74k £309.62k £603.70k £617.99k £608.79k
Income - Charitable activities £439.30k £989.93k £721.03k £573.70k £707.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £216.49k £212.92k £195.18k £218.13k £220.09k
Income - Other £0 £209.28k £909 £16.10k £27.56k
Income - Legacies £2.70k £14.00k £3.50k £289.02k £33.30k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.32m £1.47m £1.55m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £495.58k £452.44k £497.28k £570.44k £646.11k
Expenditure - Governance £84.75k £75.82k £85.10k £83.81k £91.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £27.87k £25.31k £28.87k £24.11k £22.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0