THE LIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The LIS Foundation provides bursaries, grants and scholarships to students attending the London Interdisciplinary School. In addition, it seeks to advance interdisciplinary education to the wider public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Davenport | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Evans | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Larissa Dempsey | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Amos OBE | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Isherwood | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.00k | £68.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.60k | £23.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS FACING DISADVANTAGE ATTENDING THE LONDON INTERDISCIPLINARY SCHOOL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT (INCLUDING BY AWARDING BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS) AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN APPROACHES TO AND THE IMPORTANCE OF INTERDISCIPLINARY LEARNING (INCLUDING BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES TO SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
20-30 Whitechapel Road
Whitechapel
London
E1 1EW
- Phone:
- 02034091912
- Email:
- michael.englard@lis.ac.uk
- Website:
-
lisfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window