COLLATERAL GLOBAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collateral Global is a UK registered Charity (No. 1195125) dedicated to researching, understanding, and communicating the effectiveness and collateral impacts of the responses taken by governments worldwide in response to the COVID-19 pandemic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Farha | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £388.52k | £91.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.09k | £259.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JAN 2021 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2021 as amended on 30 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY ADVANCING THE KNOWLEDGE, PRACTICE OF AND EXPERTISE IN PUBLIC HEALTH POLICY IN RESPONSE TO, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE SARS COV-2 PANDEMIC. (2) THE STUDY OF THE ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL IMPACT OF PUBLIC HEALTH POLICY MEASURES IMPLEMENTED IN RESPONSE TO, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE SARS-COV-2 PANDEMIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Marigold Drive
Bisley
WOKING
Surrey
GU24 9SF
- Phone:
- 02032902071
- Email:
- info@collateralglobal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window