JUST TEEN SUPPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Just Teen Support (Jteen) is a non-profit, volunteer led organisation committed to helping Jewish teens get the emotional wellbeing support they need. Our counsellors and professional therapists are ready to provide non-judgemental support and empowerment for Jewish adolescents going through any emotional challenges and if necessary, refer them on to the appropriate organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abraham Barr | Chair | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Binah Netzer | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saul Kelly | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eli Seliger | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Riki Greenberg | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.26k | £77.22k | £191.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.93k | £135.56k | £192.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING AN SMS (TEXT) BASED MONITORED SERVICE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS, SO THAT THEY CAN OVERCOME THE EMOTIONAL CHALLENGES THEY FACE’. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PERSONS WHOSE WELFARE IS AT RISK OR IMPAIRED BY ABUSE OR NEGLECT OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS’. 3. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE BY RAISING AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES THAT AFFECT YOUNG PEOPLE’.
Contact information
- Address:
-
119-121 Brent Street
LONDON
NW4 2DX
- Phone:
- 02080905094
- Email:
- abarr@jteen.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window