FRUIT & NUT VILLAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working across three neighbourhoods of Birmingham, Fruit & Nut Village creates, develops and improves orchards, forest gardens and other perennial food growing spaces. We bring people together, build community and create short and long term experiences to benefit our volunteers and visitors to our growing sites. Fruit & Nut Village activities are undertaken to inspire, educate and bring enjoyment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £24,430 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ewan Hamnett | Trustee | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Edmonds | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alex Connock | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.97k | £36.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £42.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 December 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 09 December 2023 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (I) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (II) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING ABOUT HORTICULTURE AND PERENNIAL FOOD GROWING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 Newlands Road
BIRMINGHAM
B30 2RH
- Phone:
- 07895692446
- Email:
- fruitandnutvillage@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window