SANATAN DHARMA MANDAL AND HINDU COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education, relieve poverty, distress and sickness, to advance the Hindu Cultural and social activities for all age groups in Cardiff for Hindu Communities and open to others. We advance social activities and cultural activities for elderly people and their carers. Demonstrate an understanding of and a commitment to equal opportunities concerning access, language, cultural, gender.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,790 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 July 1986: Standard registration
- SANATAN DHARMA MANDAL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VINODBHAI CHHOTABHAI PATEL | Chair | 28 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR HASMUKHBHAI SHAH | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HARILAL NARANDAS PATEL | Trustee | 27 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROHITBHAI C PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEMANTKUMAR GORDHANDAS PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.47k | £66.52k | £56.86k | £89.59k | £132.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.99k | £15.94k | £60.94k | £26.19k | £47.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 1988,28 JUNE 1992, 18 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGIOUS, CULTURAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES IN THE CARDIFF AREA, PARTICUARLLY BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
CARDIFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEAVIEW BUILDINGS
SPLOTT
CARDIFF
CF24 5EB
- Phone:
- 07747080251
- Email:
- vimla@newgarageuk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window