DONCASTER RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling, face to face or telephone for people, aged 14 and above, who have experienced any form of sexual abuse; also telephone help line, group work, support, information, training and awareness raising in the area of sexual abuse. Independent Sexual Violence Advocate service supports through judicial process and with other services whether reported or not.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Doncaster
Governance
- 26 June 1986: Standard registration
- 10 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DRASACS (Working name)
- DONCASTER RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE COUNSELLING CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.81k | £227.61k | £272.77k | £312.14k | £315.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.03k | £201.68k | £270.15k | £268.83k | £329.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 22 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 20 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 20 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 March 2006 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 15 March 2006 | 43 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 19 JULY 1994, 16 NOVEMBER 1999, 04 DECEMBER 2002 AND 10 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED SEXUAL ASSAULT, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING A COUNSELLING SERVICE. 2. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL DISTRESS OF PEOPLE SUPPORTING AND/OR CARING FOR ADULTS OR CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN SEXUALLY ASSAULTED BY A THIRD PARTY/PARTIES, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING, GROUPWORK AND INFORMATION. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, BY RAISING AWARENESS, AND PROMOTING AND/OR CONDUCTING EDUCATION AND RESEARCH AROUND THE ISSUES OF SEXUAL ASSAULT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window