Trustees WAINGROVES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 517734

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Colin Moss | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Andrew Davies | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Ayres | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Palmer | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Wilding | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELEY | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GRAHAM SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER EMMAS-WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CORAL THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.