DREAM INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve health and relieve sickness for the public benefit in India and The Gambia by supporting health messaging, training, and equipment; to advance education, and to promote environmental conservation and water management for public benefit in those regions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
- The Gambia
Governance
- 22 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Perumal Tamilselvan | Chair | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Marie Scanlon | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sam Michael Oscar Fredy | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hania Hussain | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohamed Thahir Kolpurka Abdul Samad | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syed SHEIK | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £18.76k | £19.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £478 | £14.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN INDIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING FOR: - SUPPORT FOR PUBLIC HEALTH MESSAGING ON DIABETES, HYPERTENSION AND CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASE. - THE TECHNICAL TRAINING OF HEALTH WORKERS TO ENABLE THEM TO GIVE ADVICE ON CHRONIC HEALTH CONDITIONS, MEDICATION MANAGEMENT AND TO ENABLE THEM TO PROVIDE DIALYSIS TREATMENT. - THE PROVISION OF TECHNICAL EQUIPMENT SUCH AS RESOURCES FOR DIALYSIS TREATMENTS. - VITAL MEDICINES. - THE ESTABLISHMENT AND RUNNING COSTS OF HEALTHCARE FACILITIES SO THAT TREATMENTS ARE MADE AVAILABLE FOR SUBSIDISED/FREE HEALTHCARE FOR PATIENTS. - THE PROVISION OF CLEAN DRINKING WATER. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN INDIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - PROVIDING FUNDING FOR HEALTH EDUCATION REGARDING THE MANAGEMENT OF LONG-TERM CONDITIONS SUCH AS HYPERTENSION, DIABETES AND CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASES AND MANAGEMENT OF DIALYSIS. - SUPPORTING EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN RURAL COMMUNITIES SUCH AS RDB SCHOOL IN PAPANASAM, TAMIL NADU, INDIA, BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS FOR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUTH SO THAT THEY ARE ABLE TO ATTEND SCHOOL AND PURSUE HIGHER EDUCATION. - PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CLASSROOMS AND SPORTS FACILITIES TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF EDUCATION FOR THE STUDENTS. - THE PROVISION OF FUNDS FOR EQUIPMENT AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS FOR RESUSCITATION TRAINING. - THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERS TO PROVIDE ACCREDITED RESUSCITATION TRAINING - ADVANCED LIFE SUPPORT (ALS) FOR HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS SUCH AS MEDICAL STUDENTS, FIRST RESPONDERS AND BASIC LIFE SUPPORT (BSL) FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CYLERS THICKET
WELWYN
AL6 9RS
- Phone:
- +447889400275
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window