THE REFUGEE HELP CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting social inclusion by providing social and recreational facilities and events involving the local community and by providing workshops, forums, advocacy and general support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lina Mohammad | Chair | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amal Suleiman | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amira Rasoul | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shilan Ali | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zeinab Mustafa | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/10/2022 | 23/10/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 October 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE MIGRANTS, INCLUDING REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, AND WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, IMMIGRATION STATUS, OR DUE TO AN ENGLISH LANGUAGE BARRIER, BY PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND BY PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT; AND 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST MIGRANTS, THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ITEMS WHICH MEET THEIR NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
Coniston Court
Eleanor Close
LONDON
SE16 6PX
- Phone:
- 07793455457
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window