PALESTINIAN REFUGEE PROJECT


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has issued an official warning Open in new window
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Palestinian Refugee Project is based i nthe Uk for fundraising but operates in Lebanon to aid and assist the Palestiniant refugees living on refugee camps within the borders of Lebanon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Lebanon
Governance
- 08 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Layton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 405 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE BENEFIT OF PALESTINIAN PEOPLE OF THE DIASPORA IN PARTICULAR LEBANON, WHO ARE IN PALESTINIAN REFUGEE CAMPS BY FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: (1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMS. (3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MEDICINES AND TREATMENT AT HEALTH CARE CENTRES. (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRYNBALA FARM
BORTH
BRYNBALA FARM
CLARACH ROAD
SY24 5NS
- Phone:
- 07941141171
- Email:
- inter.prp@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window