THE IRIS BRUFF, ROMEO & INET EFFS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non-profit organization based in London, United Kingdom. Our passion is to redefine leadership especially among young people who find themselves in very deprived areas, or who have been marginalized. We work with young people from underserved communities, empowering them to bring bold ideas to life in order to have a big impact in their communities, and change the world for good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- Jamaica
Governance
- 22 July 2021: CIO registration
- THE IBRIE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Romeo Effs | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Marchant | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £19.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £19.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 15 TO 30 IN THE UK, JAMAICA, GHANA AND SUCH OTHER COMMONWEALTH MEMBER COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS, PROGRAMMES, SERVICES AND SUPPORT DESIGNED TO: (A) ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCE EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON SOUTHBANK UNIVERSITY
CLARENCE CENTRE
6 ST. GEORGES CIRCUS
LONDON
SE1 6FE
- Phone:
- 02079936540
- Email:
- ibrie-foundation@ibrie.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window