Accounts and annual returns KINGSLEY AND NEWTON VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 517740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 10 March 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 10 March 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required