GERALD ARTHUR ROLPH FOUNDATION FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION AND EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To utilise the facilities of Allerton Park to create sufficient resources for it's maintenance and to promote and encourage access to and the study and appreciation of Allerton Park, it's contents and surroundings by students and general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 August 1986: Standard registration
- ALLERTON CASTLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLONEL DONALD LEE ROLPH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK OGLESBY | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN B WRIGHT | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK CHRISTOPHER ROLPH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400.81k | £214.90k | £98.31k | £143.55k | £142.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £416.81k | £340.88k | £168.66k | £150.77k | £153.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £25.24k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2021
(These accounts |
20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
(1) THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE BUILDINGS AND THEIR GROUNDS AND SURROUNDING PARKLAND KWOWN AS ALLERTON PARK NORTH YORKSHIRE AS SHALL OR MAY HEREAFTER BE VESTED IN THE TRUSTEES; (II) THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF FURNITURE AND PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION ORDINARY KEPT OR INTENDED TO BE KEPT AT ALLERTON PARK AS SHALL OR MAY HEREAFTER BE VESTED IN THE TRUSTEES OR LOANED TO THE TRUSTEES; (III) THE USE AND OCCUPATION OF THE CHAPEL AT ALLERTON PARK FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE PRACTICE OF WORSHIP; (IV) THE PROVISION AT ALLERTON PARK OR SUCH PART OF IT AS SHALL BE APPROPRIATE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING THE CONDTIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE INTENDED OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION WHICH WILL BE AVAILABLE TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; (V) THE FACILITATION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE USE AND OCCUPATION OF THE WHOLE OR PART OF ALLERTON PARK AND THE USE OF SUCH CHATTELS AS AFORESAID FOR CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gerald Arthur Rolph Foundation
Allerton Castle
Allerton Park
Knaresborough
HG5 0SE
- Phone:
- 01423330927
- Email:
- office@allertoncastle.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window