ALISHIRENAWAYEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community and capacity building Help members of the community to help themselves- Working with members of the community Providing a support and assistance that enables them to identify and deal with the problems that affect them as a member of Uzbek community Developing a structure which enables them to be better placed to co-operate with each other and deals with organisations in the wide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAMIL AZIZI | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
urosh ventaj | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hamidula Hamidi | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ZUHRA MOHAMMAD KARIM | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zabi karemi | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
NAJIB YASER RASOOLI | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
AHMAD JAWID ELMI | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
FARZYA OLKER | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.77k | £13.03k | £20.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.40k | £1.41k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2023 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2023 | 233 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED UK COMMUNITY OF UZBEK IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 12
Nutsford Vale
Manchester
M12 5QJ
- Phone:
- 07501920186
- Email:
- kamilazizi@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window