DRUMMOND GOSPEL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drummond Gospel Hall is an independent evangelical assembly of Christians. Activities include the Lord's Supper, Gospel meetings, bible teaching meetings, coffee mornings. Gifts from funds are made to missionaries and Christian workers in the UK and abroad who can subscribe to the statement of faith in our constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 28 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Bedford Harkness | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Garfield Carnall | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Charles Walter Sercombe | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.02k | £14.09k | £11.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.34k | £12.69k | £12.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: * TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AND PRACTICES IN THE SCHEDULE IN BOURNEMOUTH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; * TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN BOURNEMOUTH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DRUMMOND GOSPEL HALL
DRUMMOND ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 4DT
- Phone:
- 01202394952
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window