SUFFOLK ENVIRONMENTAL PROJECTS LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run and support Environmental Projects in Suffolk which we hope will have a positive impact on our planet by bringing communities together. We promote for the public benefit the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 December 2021: Standard registration
- 19 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- SICON FOUNDATION LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2021 as amended on 04 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO (A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY: (I) PROMOTING THE RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF FLORA, FAUNA OR THE ENVIRONMENT GENERALLY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF AIR QUALITY BY PLANTING, MANAGING AND MAINTAINING TREES AND HEDGEROWS ON PLOTS THAT ARE PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE, BY PROVIDING TREES AND ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY MATERIAL FOR TREE PLANTING PROJECTS WHICH ARE FURTHERING THE SAME OBJECTIVES AND BY INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN THESE PROJECTS; (II) PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY BY CREATING NEW AREAS OF WILDERNESS TO SUPPORT WILDLIFE AND MAKING SUCH AREAS ACCESSIBLE TO THE PUBLIC FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF RENEWABLE ENERGY, SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT, RECYCLING AND HOW PEOPLE’S CARBON FOOTPRINT CAN BE REDUCED, BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND INCREASING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND LEARNING IN THESE SUBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window