TAMKEEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TAMKEEN help women and poor people to start their own businesses from home by supply them with what they need to start the business like courses, equipment ,marketing their goods by organized Fun days or local market to enable them selling their handmaid food or goods ,help with printing leaflets ,give social media advises and encourage them to use the different ways of Marketing .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Halah Mahmood | Chair | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isra AlBu-Ghaddar | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arafahat Khalil | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/08/2022 | 23/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.67k | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 August 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND GUIDANCE IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT OR SELF-EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
185 GREENWOOD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M22 8BF
- Phone:
- 07851982419
- Email:
- Hala61a@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window