STORIES OF HOPE AND HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run regular sessions for people with lived experience of seeking asylum in the UK, enabling people to explore their stories and experiences, creating community and building a sense of belonging and self-worth. We facilitate encounters to share stories, especially in schools, educating others about the experience of seeking asylum, challenging misconceptions and fostering positive relationships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 20 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peleforoh Abdallah Abou Bakr | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Musharraf Abdullayeva | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tawasol Ibrahim Hamza Abdelsamad | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rachel Birks | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Oliver Trewby | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Helena Margaret Madden | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90k | £32.25k | £47.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £17.02k | £22.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS IN THE WEST MIDLANDS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING A SPACE AND COMMUNITY IN WHICH TO MEET OTHERS, BUILD FRIENDSHIPS, PRACTISE THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE, LEARN COMMUNICATION SKILLS AND CREATIVELY EXPLORE STORIES AND LIFE EXPERIENCES AS A MEANS OF INTEGRATING INTO A NEW COMMUNITY. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS WHICH INFORM PARTICIPANTS AND DEVELOP THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE LIVED EXPERIENCE OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES WHO FLEE PERSECUTION AND SETTLE IN A NEW COUNTRY, HELP TO FOSTER POSITIVE ATTITUDES TOWARDS DIVERSITY AND MIGRATION AND COUNTER MISINFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 St. Bernards Road
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 7BA
- Phone:
- 07598922095
- Email:
- info@storiesofhome.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window