MYWORLD CREATIVE PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
100 cameras are given to participants with lived experience of homelessness. They take photos of the city they live in. The emphasis is on learning the skill of photography and having fun. All participants are invited to join a weekly photography mentoring group to learn more skills with digital cameras. A calendar with the winning photos is published and sold to the public online and in markets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- New Zealand
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 16 December 2021: CIO registration
- MYWORLD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Allwright | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Henderson | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
YAU CHOY WONG | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA TREACY | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 March 2025 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2021 as amended on 31 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST HOMELESS PEOPLE AND THEIR DEPENDENTS IN THE CITIES THAT PROVIDE A MYWORLD PROJECT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING THROUGH CREATIVE PROJECTS DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT, THIS WILL BE CARRIED OUT IN PARTNERSHIP WITH CHARITIES AND/OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY RUNNING A MYWORLD PROJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21
Queens Avenue
Flat 3
London
- Phone:
- 07517141948
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window