POTTER STREET BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Potter Street Baptist Church runs as an organisation and charity to promote the Glory of God. We run various groups to support the congregation and local community and also fundraising events for ourselves and local chairites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 02 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Coote | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Akyeampong-Aye | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Murray Richard Kitson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marian Hollingsworth | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rowe | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Taylor | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW GARDNER | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CARROLL | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CORINNA ROWE | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JENKINS | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BELLWORTHY | Trustee | 16 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TEW | Trustee | 17 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS | Trustee | 19 February 1971 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.05k | £152.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.13k | £117.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
POTTER STREET BAPTIST CHURCH
98 POTTER STREET
CHAPEL LANE
HARLOW
ESSEX
- Phone:
- 01279452820
- Email:
- admin@psbc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window