Trustees POTTER STREET BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1196365

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Coote | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Akyeampong-Aye | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Murray Richard Kitson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marian Hollingsworth | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rowe | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Taylor | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW GARDNER | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CARROLL | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
CORINNA ROWE | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JENKINS | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BELLWORTHY | Trustee | 16 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TEW | Trustee | 17 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS | Trustee | 19 February 1971 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.