SCOUTMED NATIONAL SCOUT ACTIVE SUPPORT UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting actively engages and supports young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society. As a National Scout Active Support Unit we provide advice and onsite medical support to Scout Groups, Districts, Counties, Areas and National events throughout the UK, ranging from small one day events to large international jamborees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 March 2021: Standard registration
- THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION - SCOUTMED NATIONAL SCOUT ACTIVE SUPPORT UNIT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl-Heinz Paschael-Cantwell | Chair | 13 April 2004 |
|
|||||
Fernanda Katherine Sacramento Franca Lake | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Clare Watt | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Puryer | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Turner | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Waller | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £30.72k | £14.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.59k | £23.52k | £11.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967, 19 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 8 FEBRUARY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ScoutMed National SASU
The Scout Association
Gilwell Park
London
E4 7QW
- Phone:
- 03000159831
- Email:
- office@scoutmed.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window