SEFTON GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Road Safety. Improving Driver and Rider Skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Sefton
Governance
- 03 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Dring | Chair | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Preston | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Filson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Dickens | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wilde | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Lang | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hey | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Maule | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £1.55k | £2.57k | £2.79k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £691 | £2.77k | £2.19k | £2.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 21 APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ROAD SAFETY AND IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND RIDING BY HELPING MOTORISTS AND MOTOR-CYLISTS TO PASS THE ADVANCED DRIVING TEST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 KINGSTON CRESCENT
SOUTHPORT
PR9 9YJ
- Phone:
- 01704213221
- Email:
- secretary@samadvanced.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window