MADLOVE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Madlove is set up to create and promote art that will educate the public on matters of mental health, disability rights, and other areas of inequality and injustice.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Colombia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Indonesia
- Ukraine
Governance
- 25 March 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Lloyd | Chair | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pelin Basaran Harrison | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LOIS KEIDAN | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Moore | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joon-Lynn Goh | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ART FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND CREATION OF DIFFERENT ART FORMS, SUCH AS, PHOTOGRAPHY, PAINTING, DRAWING, PERFORMANCE, SCULPTURE, INSTALLATION, FILM, AND VIDEO, WITH A SPECIFIC FOCUS ON MENTAL HEALTH AND THE IMPACT OF MENTAL HEALTH FROM AN INDIVIDUAL AND SOCIAL PERSPECTIVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COACH HOUSE
37 LALEHAM ROAD
MARGATE
KENT
CT9 3QA
- Phone:
- 07723024063
- Email:
- suck@thevacuumcleaner.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.