BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR ISLAMIC STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BRAIS encourages and enhances scholarly exchange, co-operation and output by hosting an annual conference for Islamic Studies scholars and students across the UK as well as focused workshops, networking events and prizes. In addition, BRAIS operates a members contact list and social media platforms allowing Islamic Studies specialists to seek advice, support and feedback from their peers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 November 2021: CIO registration
- BRAIS (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Fozia Bora | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jaan Islam | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Haroon Ebrahim Sidat | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alyaa Ahmed Ebbiary | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lea | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Usaama Abdullah al-Azami | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/11/2022 | 15/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.08k | £21.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.21k | £21.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 November 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 November 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 November 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF RESEARCH AND TEACHING ABOUT ISLAM AND MUSLIM CULTURES AND SOCIETIES IN UK HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) PROVIDING A FORUM FOR ACADEMIC EXCHANGE FOR SCHOLARS WITH AN INTEREST IN ANY ASPECT OF ISLAM AND THE MUSLIM WORLD, PAST AND PRESENT, INCLUDING MUSLIM MINORITY SOCIETIES; (B) THE HOLDING OF CONFERENCES AND EVENTS; (C) THE SUPPORT OF ACCESS TO ARCHIVES AND INFORMATION ABOUT ISLAM AND THE MUSLIM WORLD; (D) THE PURSUIT OF ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES PROMOTING ISLAMIC STUDIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MIDDLE EAST CENTRE
ST ANTHONY'S COLLEGE
68 WOODSTOCK ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6JF
- Phone:
- 01316506686
- Email:
- brais@ed.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window