THE HAMILTON-DUVAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1194637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the charity are the advancement of education in, and appreciation of, the art of opera for the public benefit by the provision of grants of financial assistance to enable students of opera to pursue their musical education in opera through study at professional specialist establishments in the UK and elsewhere in preparation for entry into careers as professional artists.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Hamilton Chair 23 May 2021
None on record
Arshak Kuzikyan Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Anush Hovhannisyan Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/04/2022 15/04/2023 15/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2023 20 May 2024 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2022 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Heritage Capital Management LTD
BROADWAY HOUSE
TOTHILL STREET
LONDON
SW1H 9NQ
Phone:
02077992110