THE SURGICAL GASTRO ENTEROLOGICAL RESEARCH AND TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of funds for research into gatroenterological disease
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 15 July 1986: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £730 | £758 | £1.57k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.50k | £8.82k | £484 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 September 2012 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL EDUCATION IN SURGICAL GASTRO ENTEROLOGY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH MEDICAL RESEARCH AS MAY CONTRIBUTE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH MEDICAL EDUCATION AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC; (C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM GASTRO ENTEROLOLICAL ILLNESSES OR DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window