QUEERCIRCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Queercircle is an LGBTQ led charity working at the intersection of arts, culture and social action. Our community focused programme of exhibition commissions, participatory residencies and learning and participation activities are delivered to strengthen links between arts, culture, health and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £58,750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
Governance
- 21 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Nolan | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samar Shams | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLARA DUBLANC | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lasoye | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ryan | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Nicola Hensfield | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Rolls-Bentley Wilde | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.52k | £302.25k | £431.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.89k | £332.48k | £399.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £108.58k | £58.95k | £58.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WORLDWIDE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING A SAFE ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH LGBTQ+ PEOPLE MAY CONNECT, CREATE AND BUILD A SENSE OF COMMUNITY; 2. SUPPORTING THE PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF ART BY LGBTQ+ ARTISTS; 3. CREATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC TO ACCESS AND ENGAGE WITH LGBTQ+ ARTS AND CULTURE; 4. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR LGBTQ+ DIVERSITY AND CULTURAL EXPRESSION; 5. CREATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR INTERNATIONAL CULTURAL EXCHANGE AND INTERACTION BETWEEN LGBTQ+ ARTISTS; 6. STRENGTHENING LINKS BETWEEN CULTURE AND HEALTH TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL WELL-BEING OF LGBTQ+ PEOPLE; 7. INCREASING DIVERSITY IN THE CULTURAL AND CREATIVE SECTORS BY HELPING TO CREATE EDUCATION, WORK EXPERIENCE AND WIDER CAREER AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR LGBTQ+ PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Barton Yard
Soames Walk
LONDON
SE10 0BN
- Phone:
- 07542593263
- Email:
- ashley@queercircle.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window