SANTON BRIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Santon Bridge Village Hall provides facilities for recreation / training / education to residents of and visitors to the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 April 2024
Total income includes £101 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,005 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 April 2021: CIO registration
- 15 August 2024: Funds received from 1117609 SANTON BRIDGE INSTITUTE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Charles Warren | Chair | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Swallow | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Attracta Fryer | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Jane Marie Warren | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Thornton | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Colin William Fisher | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Fryer | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Elleray | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Craghill | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Wendy Adams | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Benn | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Mercer | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/04/2022 | 19/04/2023 | 19/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £40.51k | £14.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16 | £4.89k | £8.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £101 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF IRTON WITH SANTON, HOLMROOK, CUMBRIA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SANTON BRIDGE VILLAGE HALL
SANTON BRIDGE
IRTON
HOLMROOK
CUMBRIA
CA19 1UY
- Phone:
- 01946726580
- Email:
- info@hallflatfarm.co.uk
- Website:
-
santonbridgehall.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window