ROCHDALE ACTION WITH DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES

Charity Number: 1195518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide temporary accommodation and support to destitute asylum seekers and refugees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £19,742
Total expenditure: £12,976

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Rochdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • RADAR (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cllr. William Mark Sheerin Trustee 02 December 2021
THE NORMAN BARNES FUND
Received: On time
EAST LANCASHIRE RAILWAY TRUST LIMITED
Received: 19 days late
JANICE HICKS Trustee 02 December 2021
ROCHDALE & LITTLEBOROUGH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOHN WIGLEY Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
BARBARA MARY REDMOND Trustee 26 March 2021
Bamford Chapel and Norden United Reformed Church
Received: On time
DEREK WHITE Trustee 26 March 2021
ROCHDALE HEARTBEAT
Received: On time
CHRISTINE MARY MATHEWSON Trustee 26 March 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.72k £14.38k £19.74k
Total expenditure £2.65k £5.39k £12.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Linnell Drive
ROCHDALE
Greater Manchester
OL11 5QP
Phone:
07422964669