Financial history REVESBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 517796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.20k £11.09k £2.28k £3.25k £19.30k
Total expenditure £4.48k £1.52k £6.25k £2.56k £19.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £461
Income from government grants N/A £10.10k N/A N/A £15.68k