FOUR OAKS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of Early Years Childcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 May 2021: CIO registration
- 09 April 2025: Funds received from 1041584 FOUR OAKS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Gardner | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Sanford | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Shanahan | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jones | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Komal Dhindsa | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mullan | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Balli | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 173 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2024 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2024 | 539 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE STATUTORY FRAMEWORK FOR THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE EARLY YEARS ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOUR OAKS PRE SCHOOL
EDGE HILL ROAD
FOUR OAKS
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B74 4PA
- Phone:
- 07966147584
- Email:
- fouroakspspg@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window