PRITHI UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prithi UK provides specific support to organisations in Sri Lanka that, in turn, support children and adults with disabilities. Prithi UK carries out a range of activities aimed at generating income and awareness with the intention of assisting organisations working with people with disabilities, specifically in Sri Lanka, where such groups are particularly disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 11 October 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Louise Egerton | Chair | 17 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Nallamilli | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Donnelly-Brown | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER EGERTON | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul de Kretser | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.99k | £19.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.34k | £5.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISABILITIES LIVING IN SRI LANKA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO FURTHER THIS PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 PRIORY WAY
NORTH HARROW
MIDDLESEX
HA2 6DH
- Phone:
- 02088631661
- Email:
- prithiuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window