Governing document THE STAFFORDSHIRE BAND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 1989, 23 MAY 1990, 26 MAY 1993 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 1999 as amended on 10 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO OBJECTS OF THE BAND ARE - A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF WALSALL AND THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA GENERALLY IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO BRASS BAND MUSIC; AND B. TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THOUGHT FIT.
Area of benefit
WALSALL AND THE WEST MIDLANDS AREA GENERALLY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.