Accounts and annual returns EARTH'S GREEN GUARDIANS (EGG) TRUST

Charity number: 1194985
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
Annual return 13 June 2023 13 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2023 13 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 June 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window