COUNSELLING IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling in the Community is a self referral mental health service offering adult, children and young persons' counselling to Blackpool, Wyre and Fylde. These are areas where it can be difficult to access mainstream services and private counselling can be costly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
82 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 September 2021: CIO registration
- CITC (Working name)
- COUNSELLING IN THE COMMUNITY CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Andrew Scott | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Lee Tumalty | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Whittington | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Khalaf | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.63k | £134.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.09k | £138.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH IN BLACKPOOL AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, ADVOCACY AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Waterloo Road
BLACKPOOL
Blackpool
Lancashire
FY4 1AD
- Phone:
- 08081963483
- Email:
- contact@citc.team
- Website:
-
citc.team
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window