NOAH'S PINK BALLOON LEUKAEMIA FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity funds medical research in the areas of paediatric haematology, paediatric oncology and invasive fungal infections attributable to the high infection risk of blood cancer patients. We support the future care, diagnosis and treatment of children with blood cancer to help save children's lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 2021: CIO registration
- NOAH'S PINK BALLOON LEUKEMIA FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN TESSELAAR | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIEDERICK TESSELAAR | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.82k | £52.70k | £77.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £117.47k | £83.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jul 2021 as amended on 10 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH ACUTE LYMPHOBLASTIC LEUKAEMIA AND ALL SUB-FORMS OF THE DISEASE (FOR EXAMPLE, THE PHILADELPHIA CHROMOSOME) AND THOSE CHILDREN WITH CANCER WHO ALSO CONTRACT FUNGAL INFECTIONS SUCH AS ASPERGILLUS OR MUCORMYCOSIS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES SPECIFIC TO THEIR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, BEHAVIOUR AND TREATMENT OF CANCEROUS CELLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Claremont Road
TWICKENHAM
TW1 2QY
- Phone:
- 07768452622
- Website:
-
noahspinkballoon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window