Stockport County Community Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity arranges, promotes and delivers activities for the benefit of the public in particular in Stockport and its surrounding areas, including community participation in healthy recreation for children and other citizens who have needs due to their disablement, poverty or other social and economic circumstances - with the aim of improving their overall health, skills and conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£783,414
Donations and legacies | £135.67k | |
Charitable activities | £534.50k | |
Other trading activities | £113.24k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£600,507
Raising funds | £130.38k | |
Charitable activities | £470.13k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £75,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £130.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £470.13k | |
Retained for future use | £182.91k |
People

22 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 16 April 2021: Standard registration
- County Community Trust (Working name)
- THE HATTERS PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael Stevenson MBE | Chair | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Cheetham | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Brown MBE | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Giles Peter Beswick | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David James Glyn Ancell | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Swindells | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.02k | £499.23k | £783.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.52k | £432.61k | £600.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £75.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £135.67k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £113.24k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £534.50k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £470.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £130.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £64.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £4.44k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £380.49k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £93.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 MAR 2021 as amended on 30 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
2.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, IN PARTICULAR IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF STOCKPORT AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION): 2.1.(A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH; 2.1.(B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2.1.(C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS (INCLUDING THEIR ACADEMIC, SOCIAL, PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND SKILLS TRAINING) THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; 2.1.(D) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY WAY OF ANY DISADVANTAGE BY DEVELOPING THEIR CAPACITY AND SKILLS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 2.1.(E) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE COMMUNITY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER MATERIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOCKPORT COUNTY FOOTBALL CLUB
EDGELEY PARK
HARDCASTLE ROAD
STOCKPORT
SK3 9DD
- Phone:
- 0161 266 2700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window