Trustees MENTAL HEALTH MOTORBIKE
Charity number: 1196406

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Haczewski | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Liam Fassam | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Mary Lomas | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steve Solley | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Moore | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Marshall | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Kay Stephens | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Cole | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Oxborough | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.