PROMOTING AUTONOMY AND CHANGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PAC provides therapeutic interventions for young people aged 6 to 25 presenting with emotional, interpersonal and mental health problems and challenges often with associated learning disability. By delivering this preventative work young people address their problems before they escalate, they re-engage into education or employment and live more positive lives within society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £85,250 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 August 1986: Standard registration
- PRACTICAL ALTERNATIVES TO CUSTODY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Madeliene Wilcox | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Ruth Lowe | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matt Whitfield | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adele Pemberton | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.05k | £191.64k | £168.63k | £145.72k | £232.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.84k | £196.53k | £166.32k | £139.12k | £177.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £85.25k | £85.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.00k | £84.00k | £84.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/11/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE CARE, EDUCATION TRAINING AND TREATMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE CONVICTED OF OFFENCES WHO WOULD OTHERWISE RECEIVE CUSTODIAL SENTENCES OR RESIDENTIAL CARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
P A C Ltd
14 Lowther Street
CARLISLE
CA3 8DA
- Phone:
- 01228533874
- Email:
- info@pac-therapy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window