LONG MEAD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation and enhancement of the biodiversity of the floodplain meadows along the Upper Thames including advancing understanding of and developing methods to restore the meadows. Contributing to the education of the public on nature based solutions for climate-change particularly in relation to floodplain meadows and offering nature-based activities to adults with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Kevan Martin | Chair | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ravenscroft | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Louise Henson | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.85k | £38.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.80k | £25.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.72k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY A. TO UNDERTAKE THE CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE BIODIVERSITY OF THE FLOODPLAIN MEADOWS ALONG THE UPPER THAMES; B. TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING OF, AND METHODS TO, RESTORE THE ECOSYSTEMS OF FLOODPLAIN MEADOWS WORKING WITH ACADEMIC INSTITUTIONS, FARMERS AND LANDOWNERS; C. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING NATURE-BASED SOLUTIONS FOR CLIMATE-CHANGE, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO FLOODPLAIN MEADOWS; 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND AUTISM BY OFFERING NATURE-BASED ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horseshoe Island
Oxford Road
Swinford
WITNEY
OX29 4DU
- Phone:
- 07816675460
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window